U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03178
  • Case Name: Rogers v. NC Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.