U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01493-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Darnell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 26, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.