U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02095
  • Case Name: White v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 29, 2022: [Document]
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 09, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • November 09, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Document]
  • August 17, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Declaration]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 31, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 27, 2022: [Document]
  • May 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.