U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chapman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 17, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.