U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.