U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01509-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foerster
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 19, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 19, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.