U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seiuli
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.