U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01504-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2022: [Document]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.