U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01503-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.