U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01514-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Page
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • December 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • October 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 10, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.