U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03179
  • Case Name: Fraley v. Snipes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Request for Production of Documents]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 02, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.