U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01516-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pless
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.