U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01515-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pereira-Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.