U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01533-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero Rivera
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.