U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01528-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tunwars
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.