U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01527-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.