U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02096
  • Case Name: Jones v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.