U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01520-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zaleski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.