U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.