U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01517-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.