U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joinder ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [1Fox Case Reassigned]
  • June 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.