U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02097
  • Case Name: Thompson v. United States
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Document]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 06, 2022: [Document]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.