U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Speener
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joinder ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.