U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pruden
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.