U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mc-00096
  • Case Name: Wheeler v. Philips North America, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • June 07, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • June 06, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [MC-Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.