U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03181
  • Case Name: Grant v. Kuchen et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.