U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Bond ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.