U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03184
  • Case Name: Mos-Bey v. Shroeder et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 09, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • July 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.