U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02099
  • Case Name: Harper v. Superintendent Warden
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 17, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 17, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.