U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01552-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 16, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.