U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02102
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bowie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 10, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.