U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02101
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rinaldie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 14, 2022: [Habeas Corpus Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.