U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02100
  • Case Name: Warner v. Ramos et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 19, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 17, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Document]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • September 23, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Recusal]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reassign Case]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response]
  • June 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.