U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivens, et. al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • June 10, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.