U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ward
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.