U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01558-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.