U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03187
  • Case Name: Moore v. Hughes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 15, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.