U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03186
  • Case Name: Ruff v. Deas et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • May 05, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • December 16, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • October 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.