U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mance
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Findings of Fact]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 09, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 26, 2022: [Witness List]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.