U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01562-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.