U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01560-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.