U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01559-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.