U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jean
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed) ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Seal ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.