U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vilius
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.