U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01565-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 06, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.