U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01567-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.