U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01571-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.