U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03190
  • Case Name: Williams v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 28, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.