U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03189
  • Case Name: Mosby v. Legget et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 05, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.