U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Bond ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.